PA HR644 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-6)
Status: Passed on January 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-22 - Adopted (188-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-6)
Status: Passed on January 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-22 - Adopted (188-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution designating the week of January 19 through 25, 2020, as "Healthy Weight Week" and designating January 23, 2020, as "Women's Healthy Weight Day" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Designating the week of January 19 through 25, 2020, as "Healthy Weight Week" and designating January 23, 2020, as "Women's Healthy Weight Day" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-22 - House - House Floor: HR 644 PN 3042 (Y: 188 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-22 | House | Adopted (188-0) |
2020-01-14 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-12-17 | House | Referred to HEALTH |