PA HR64 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-11)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-10 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-10 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution establishing a legislative task force on the delivery of high-speed broadband services and directing the Joint State Government Commission to establish an advisory committee to conduct a study on the delivery of high-speed broadband services in unserved areas and underserved areas of this Commonwealth and to report its findings and recommendations to the House of Representatives.
Title
Establishing a legislative task force on the delivery of high-speed broadband services and directing the Joint State Government Commission to establish an advisory committee to conduct a study on the delivery of high-speed broadband services in unserved areas and underserved areas of this Commonwealth and to report its findings and recommendations to the House of Representatives.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-10-23 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-10 | House | Removed from table |
2020-11-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-08-31 | House | Removed from table |
2020-08-31 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-26 | House | Removed from table |
2020-05-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-04-16 | House | Removed from table |
2020-04-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-01-14 | House | Removed from table |
2020-01-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-10-23 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |