PA HR579 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-9)
Status: Passed on November 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-21 - Adopted (184-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-9)
Status: Passed on November 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-21 - Adopted (184-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution designating November 25, 2019, as "Elimination of Violence Against Women Day" in Pennsylvania to coincide with the United Nations' "International Day for the Elimination of Violence Against Women."
Title
Designating November 25, 2019, as "Elimination of Violence Against Women Day" in Pennsylvania to coincide with the United Nations' "International Day for the Elimination of Violence Against Women."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-21 - House - House Floor: HR 579 PN 2725 (Y: 184 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-21 | House | Adopted (184-0) |
2019-11-19 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-10-21 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |