PA HR462 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-8)
Status: Passed on September 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-12 - Adopted (190-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-8)
Status: Passed on September 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-12 - Adopted (190-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution designating the weeks of August 28 through September 1, 2017, and September 4 through September 8, 2017, as "Back to School Weeks" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Designating the weeks of August 28 through September 1, 2017, and September 4 through September 8, 2017, as "Back to School Weeks" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-12 - House - House Floor: UNCONTESTED CALENDAR (Y: 190 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-12 | House | Adopted (190-1) |
2017-09-05 | House | INTRODUCED AS NONCONTROVERSIAL RESOLUTION UNDER RULE 35 |