PA HR440 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-9)
Status: Introduced on September 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-14 - Re-committed to RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-14 - Re-committed to RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution honoring African-American World War II Army Staff Sergeant Waverly Woodson, Jr., on the 75th anniversary of D-Day for his heroic actions as a corporal and combat medic on Omaha Beach on June 6, 1944.
Title
Honoring African-American World War II Army Staff Sergeant Waverly Woodson, Jr., on the 75th anniversary of D-Day for his heroic actions as a corporal and combat medic on Omaha Beach on June 6, 1944.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-24 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-14 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2020-04-06 | House | Removed from table |
2020-04-06 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-12-17 | House | Removed from table |
2019-12-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-09-24 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-09-03 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |