PA HR415 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-4)
Status: Passed on September 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-25 - Adopted (197-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-4)
Status: Passed on September 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-25 - Adopted (197-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution recognizing the historical importance of the 15th Amendment to the Constitution of the United States and encouraging the establishment of a monument upon the grounds of the Pennsylvania State Capitol Complex.
Title
Recognizing the historical importance of the 15th Amendment to the Constitution of the United States and encouraging the establishment of a monument upon the grounds of the Pennsylvania State Capitol Complex.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-25 - House - House Floor: HR 415 PN 2189 (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-09-17 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-17 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-25 | House | Adopted (197-0) |
2019-09-18 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-06-19 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |