PA HR318 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Passed on October 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-10-22 - Adopted (152-50)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A Resolution directing the Legislative Budget and Finance Committee to conduct a study, issue a report and make recommendations on the current status, management, structure, policies and finances of the Pennsylvania Interscholastic Athletic Association.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directing the Legislative Budget and Finance Committee to conduct a study, issue a report and make recommendations on the current status, management, structure, policies and finances of the Pennsylvania Interscholastic Athletic Association.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-10-22 - House - House Floor: HR 318 PN 3788 (Y: 152 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-10-22 - House - House Floor: HR 318 PN 2593, 2023 A6006 (Y: 105 N: 97 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-10-22 - House - House Floor: HR 318 PN 2593, 2023 A5858 (Y: 100 N: 102 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-10-07 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-10-22HouseAdopted (152-50)
2024-10-22HouseAmended
2024-10-07HouseReported as committed
2024-02-09HouseReferred to EDUCATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2023&sind=0&body=H&type=R&bn=318
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2023&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=R&billNbr=0318&pn=2593
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2023&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=R&billNbr=0318&pn=3788
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/HA/Public/HaCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sYear=2023&sInd=0&body=H&type=R&bn=0318&pn=2593&aYear=2023&an=06006
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/HA/Public/HaCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sYear=2023&sInd=0&body=H&type=R&bn=0318&pn=2593&aYear=2023&an=05858
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&cteeCde=12&theDate=10/07/2024&RollCallId=2487
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2023&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1586
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2023&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1587
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2023&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1588

Bill Comments

feedback