PA HR284 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A Resolution urging the Congress of the United States to repeal the Environmental Protection Agency's MS4 program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging the Congress of the United States to repeal the Environmental Protection Agency's MS4 program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-07 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-16HouseRemoved from table
2018-04-16HouseLaid on the table
2017-12-11HouseRemoved from table
2017-12-11HouseLaid on the table
2017-10-04HouseRemoved from table
2017-10-04HouseLaid on the table
2017-07-08HouseRemoved from table
2017-07-08HouseLaid on the table
2017-06-07HouseReported as committed
2017-04-25HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback