PA HR281 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 75-44)
Status: Passed on May 12 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-12 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 75-44)
Status: Passed on May 12 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-12 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution designating the week of May 17 through 23, 2009, as "Emergency Medical Services Week" in Pennsylvania; designating May 21, 2009, as "Emergency Medical Services Day" in Pennsylvania; designating May 22, 2009, as "Emergency Medical Services Personnel Day" in Pennsylvania; and designating May 23, 2009, as "Moment of Silence Day" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Designating the week of May 17 through 23, 2009, as "Emergency Medical Services Week" in Pennsylvania; designating May 21, 2009, as "Emergency Medical Services Day" in Pennsylvania; designating May 22, 2009, as "Emergency Medical Services Personnel Day" in Pennsylvania; and designating May 23, 2009, as "Moment of Silence Day" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-12 - House - HR 281 PN 1708 (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-12 | Adopted | |
2009-04-30 | INTRODUCED AS NONCONTROVERSIAL RESOLUTION UNDER RULE 35 |