PA HR213 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-29 - Adopted (165-35)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-29 - Adopted (165-35)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution urging the Congress of the United States to fund measures to protect the power grid of the United States from electromagnetic pulse attacks and solar flare incidents.
Title
Urging the Congress of the United States to fund measures to protect the power grid of the United States from electromagnetic pulse attacks and solar flare incidents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-29 - House - House Floor: HR 213 PN 3297 (Y: 165 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: To Table (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-06-23 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: To Table (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-29 | House | Adopted (165-35) |
2022-06-27 | House | Reported as committed |
2022-06-22 | House | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |