PA HR129 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution establishing the Task Force on Women Veterans' Health Care within the Joint State Government Commission.
Title
A Concurrent Resolution establishing the Task Force on Women Veterans' Health Care within the Joint State Government Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - House - House Floor: HR 129 PN 2640 (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A03489 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A03489 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2022-05-24 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-05-24 | House | Adopted (203-0) |
2022-05-23 | House | Removed from table |
2022-05-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-01-24 | House | Reported as amended |
2021-08-05 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |