PA HR112 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-17)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-10-29 - Laid on the table
Status: Introduced on March 19 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-10-29 - Laid on the table
Summary
A Resolution directing the Department of Environmental Protection to identify and implement policies which encourage the use of current electronic waste recycling programs and expand existing programs.
Title
A Resolution directing the Department of Environmental Protection to identify and implement policies which encourage the use of current electronic waste recycling programs and expand existing programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-10-29 | Laid on the table | |
2007-09-25 | Removed from table | |
2007-09-25 | Laid on the table | |
2007-07-05 | Removed from table | |
2007-07-05 | Laid on the table | |
2007-06-19 | Removed from table | |
2007-06-19 | Laid on the table | |
2007-05-08 | Reported as committed | |
2007-03-19 | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=R&bn=112 |