PA HB993 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-24 - Act No. 132
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-24 - Act No. 132
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 13, 1967 (P.L.31, No.21), known as the Public Welfare Code, changing the name of the Department of Public Welfare to the Department of Human Services; providing for a transition period; and establishing a toll-free DHS fraud tip line.
Title
Changing the name of the Department of Public Welfare to the Department of Human Services; providing for a transition period; and establishing a toll-free DHS fraud tip line.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-07-01 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-10 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-01 - House - HB 993 PN 1157, FP (Y: 137 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-12-10 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-01 - House - HB 993 PN 1157, FP (Y: 137 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-24 | House | Act No. 132 |
2014-09-24 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2014-09-23 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2014-09-22 | House | Signed in Senate |
2014-09-17 | House | Signed in House |
2014-09-17 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (155-35) |
2014-09-16 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2014-07-09 | House | Referred to RULES |
2014-07-08 | House | In the House |
2014-07-08 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2013-12-11 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-12-11 | Senate | Second consideration |
2013-12-10 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-12-10 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2013-07-19 | Senate | Referred to PUBLIC HEALTH AND WELFARE |
2013-07-01 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-07-01 | House | Third consideration and final passage (137-65) |
2013-07-01 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-06-29 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-06-29 | House | Second consideration |
2013-06-28 | House | Removed from table |
2013-05-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-05-14 | House | Removed from table |
2013-03-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-03-20 | House | First consideration |
2013-03-20 | House | Reported as committed |
2013-03-13 | House | Referred to HUMAN SERVICES |