PA HB99 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 99
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 99
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 8 (Boroughs and Incorporated Towns) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in contracts, further providing for regulation of contracts.
Title
In contracts, further providing for regulation of contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-17 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - House - House Floor: HB 99 PN 4254, CONCUR (Y: 187 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-10-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 99 PN 4254, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House Floor: HB 99 PN 424, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A00115 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - House - House Floor: HB 99 PN 4254, CONCUR (Y: 187 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-10-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 99 PN 4254, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House Floor: HB 99 PN 424, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A00115 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-24 | House | Act No. 99 |
2018-10-24 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2018-10-17 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2018-10-17 | House | Signed in Senate |
2018-10-17 | House | Signed in House |
2018-10-17 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (187-0) |
2018-10-17 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2018-10-17 | House | Referred to RULES |
2018-10-16 | House | In the House |
2018-10-16 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2018-10-15 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2018-10-15 | Senate | Removed from table |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Reverted to Prior Printer's No. 424 in Senate Committee on Local Government |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Re-committed to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2017-12-12 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-12-12 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2017-03-21 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-03-21 | House | Third consideration and final passage (197-0) |
2017-03-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-03-20 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-03-20 | House | Second consideration |
2017-03-13 | House | Removed from table |
2017-02-08 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-02-08 | House | First consideration |
2017-02-08 | House | Reported as amended |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |