PA HB987 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on November 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-03 - Act No. 107 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on November 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-03 - Act No. 107 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in licensing of drivers, further providing for suspension of operating privilege.
Title
In licensing of drivers, further providing for suspension of operating privilege.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-10-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 987 PN 1000, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House Floor: HB 987 PN 1000, FP (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House Floor: HB 987 PN 1000, FP (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-03 | Senate | Act No. 107 of 2022 |
2022-11-03 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2022-10-27 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2022-10-26 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2022-10-26 | Senate | Signed in House |
2022-10-25 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2022-09-20 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Removed from table |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2022-01-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2021-06-08 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-06-08 | House | Third consideration and final passage (203-0) |
2021-06-08 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-05-26 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-05-26 | House | Second consideration |
2021-05-25 | House | Removed from table |
2021-05-05 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-05-05 | House | First consideration |
2021-05-05 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-03-19 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |