PA HB984 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-11)
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-26 - Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-26 - Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 19, 1974 (P.L.973, No.319), known as the Pennsylvania Farmland and Forest Land Assessment Act of 1974, further providing for split-off, separation or transfer; and providing for removal of land from preferential assessment.
Title
Further providing for split-off, separation or transfer; and providing for removal of land from preferential assessment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-06-23 - House - HB 984 PN 2209, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-17 - House - HB 984 PN 2054, 2009 A1794, MAHER (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-17 - House - HB 984 PN 2054, 2009 A1794, MAHER (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-26 | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS | |
2009-06-23 | In the Senate | |
2009-06-23 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-06-17 | Second consideration, with amendments | |
2009-06-17 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-06-15 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-06-15 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-06-09 | Re-committed to RULES | |
2009-06-09 | First consideration | |
2009-06-09 | Reported as amended | |
2009-03-18 | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |