PA HB980 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-02 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-02 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 51 (Military Affairs) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in State Veterans' Commission and Deputy Adjutant General for Veterans' Affairs, further providing for State Veterans' Commission.
Title
In State Veterans' Commission and Deputy Adjutant General for Veterans' Affairs, further providing for State Veterans' Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-30 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-30 - House - House Floor: HB 980 PN 1110, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-30 - House - House Floor: HB 980 PN 1110, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-02 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2020-09-30 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-09-30 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2020-09-30 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-09-29 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-09-29 | House | Second consideration |
2020-09-17 | House | Removed from table |
2020-09-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-09-16 | House | First consideration |
2020-09-16 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-03-26 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |