PA HB970 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-6)
Status: Passed on July 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-05 - Act No. 100
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-6)
Status: Passed on July 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-05 - Act No. 100
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act providing for the validity of electronic documents; authorizing county recorders of deeds to receive electronic documents as a means for recording real property; granting powers and duties to the county recorders of deeds; establishing the Electronic Recording Commission; and prescribing standards of uniformity.
Title
Providing for the validity of electronic documents; authorizing county recorders of deeds to receive electronic documents as a means for recording real property; granting powers and duties to the county recorders of deeds; establishing the Electronic Recording Commission; and prescribing standards of uniformity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-29 - House - HB 970 PN 3493, CONCUR (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Senate - HB 970 PN 3493, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-18 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-08 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-20 - House - HB 970 PN 2890, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-12-13 - House - HB 970 PN 2051, 2011 A7350, METZGAR (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-12-13 - House - HB 970 PN 2051, 2011 A7350, SUSP RULES, METZGAR (Y: 189 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Senate - HB 970 PN 3493, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-18 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-08 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-20 - House - HB 970 PN 2890, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-12-13 - House - HB 970 PN 2051, 2011 A7350, METZGAR (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-12-13 - House - HB 970 PN 2051, 2011 A7350, SUSP RULES, METZGAR (Y: 189 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-05 | House | Act No. 100 |
2012-07-05 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2012-06-29 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2012-06-29 | House | Signed in Senate |
2012-06-29 | House | Signed in House |
2012-06-29 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (198-0) |
2012-06-29 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2012-06-26 | House | Referred to RULES |
2012-06-25 | House | In the House |
2012-06-25 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2012-06-19 | Senate | Second consideration |
2012-06-18 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2012-06-05 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2012-05-08 | Senate | First consideration |
2012-05-08 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2012-01-09 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2011-12-20 | Senate | In the Senate |
2011-12-20 | House | Third consideration and final passage (197-0) |
2011-12-13 | House | Removed from table |
2011-12-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-12-13 | House | Amended on third consideration |
2011-10-25 | House | Removed from table |
2011-10-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-06-27 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2011-06-26 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-06-26 | House | Second consideration |
2011-06-26 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2011-06-08 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2011-06-08 | House | First consideration |
2011-06-08 | House | Reported as amended |
2011-03-08 | House | Referred to COMMERCE |