PA HB950 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Referred to INTERGOVERNMENTAL OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Intergovernmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of June 25, 1982 (P.L.633, No.181), known as the Regulatory Review Act, further providing for procedures for subsequent review of disapproved final-form or final-omitted regulations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for procedures for subsequent review of disapproved final-form or final-omitted regulations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Floor: HB 950 PN 958, FP (Y: 109 N: 92 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A00736 (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-05SenateReferred to INTERGOVERNMENTAL OPERATIONS
2021-05-04SenateIn the Senate
2021-05-04HouseThird consideration and final passage (109-92)
2021-05-04HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-05-03HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-05-03HouseSecond consideration
2021-04-21HouseRemoved from table
2021-04-20HouseLaid on the table
2021-04-20HouseFirst consideration
2021-04-20HouseReported as committed
2021-03-17HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=950
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0950&pn=0958
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0950P0958.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=04/20/2021&RollCallId=308
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=04/20/2021&RollCallId=309
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=186
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/04/2021&RollCallId=375

Bill Comments 750

feedback