PA HB944 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-24 - Act No. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-24 - Act No. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 21, 1998 (P.L.1307, No.174), known as the Community and Economic Improvement Act, further providing for definitions, for powers of municipal corporations, for creation of neighborhood improvement districts, for creation of neighborhood improvement district management associations, for powers of neighborhood improvement district management associations, for annual audit and report and for applicability.
Title
Further providing for definitions, for powers of municipal corporations, for creation of neighborhood improvement districts, for creation of neighborhood improvement district management associations, for powers of neighborhood improvement district management associations, for annual audit and report and for applicability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-17 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - House - House Floor: HB 944 PN 2846, CONCUR (Y: 192 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 944 PN 2846, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate Community, Economic And Recreational Development: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate Community, Economic And Recreational Development: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-05 - House - House Floor: HB 944 PN 1223, FP (Y: 187 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-11-24 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-24 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - House - House Commerce: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - House - House Commerce: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - House - House Floor: HB 944 PN 2846, CONCUR (Y: 192 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 944 PN 2846, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate Community, Economic And Recreational Development: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate Community, Economic And Recreational Development: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-05 - House - House Floor: HB 944 PN 1223, FP (Y: 187 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-11-24 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-24 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - House - House Commerce: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - House - House Commerce: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-24 | House | Act No. 28 |
2016-05-24 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2016-05-18 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2016-05-17 | House | Signed in Senate |
2016-05-17 | House | Signed in House |
2016-05-17 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (192-2) |
2016-05-17 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2016-05-16 | House | Referred to RULES |
2016-05-10 | House | In the House |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Second consideration |
2016-02-09 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2015-12-17 | Senate | Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT |
2015-12-05 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-12-05 | House | Third consideration and final passage (187-2) |
2015-12-05 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-12-04 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-12-04 | House | Second consideration |
2015-12-03 | House | Removed from table |
2015-11-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-11-24 | House | First consideration |
2015-11-24 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-09-29 | House | Re-referred to URBAN AFFAIRS |
2015-09-29 | House | Reported with request to re-refer to URBAN AFFAIRS |
2015-04-15 | House | Referred to COMMERCE |