PA HB941 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-25 - Act No. 120
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of June 13, 1967 (P.L.31, No.21), known as the Human Services Code, in public assistance, further providing for medical assistance pharmacy services and providing for prescription drug pricing study.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In public assistance, further providing for medical assistance pharmacy services and providing for prescription drug pricing study.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-11-20 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 941 PN 4617, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS TO SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-18 - House - House Floor: HB 941 PN 4617, CONCUR (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-11-18 - House - House Rules: Adopt Amendment A07890 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-18 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 941 PN 4574, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 941 PN 4049, A7756, AUMENT AMENDMENT NO. A-7756 (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-20 - House - House Floor: HB 941 PN 2922, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - House - House Floor: HB 941 PN 1748, 2019 A3878, HEFFLEY (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-25SenateAct No. 120
2020-11-25SenateApproved by the Governor
2020-11-20SenatePresented to the Governor
2020-11-20SenateSigned in Senate
2020-11-20SenateSigned in House
2020-11-20SenateSenate concurred in House amendments to Senate amendments (49-0)
2020-11-20SenateRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2020-11-18SenateReferred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
2020-11-18SenateIn the Senate
2020-11-18HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments, as amended by the House (201-0)
2020-11-18HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as amended
2020-10-26HouseReferred to RULES
2020-10-21HouseIn the House
2020-10-21SenateThird consideration and final passage (47-2)
2020-10-21SenateRe-reported as committed
2020-10-20SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-10-20SenateAmended on third consideration (45-3)
2020-10-05SenateRemoved from table
2020-10-05SenateLaid on the table
2020-06-30SenateSecond consideration
2020-06-29SenateFirst consideration
2020-06-29SenateReported as amended
2019-11-22SenateReferred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
2019-11-20SenateIn the Senate
2019-11-20HouseThird consideration and final passage (197-0)
2019-11-20HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-11-19HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-11-19HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-10-30HouseRemoved from table
2019-09-17HouseLaid on the table
2019-09-17HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-11HouseRe-committed to RULES
2019-06-11HouseFirst consideration
2019-06-11HouseReported as committed
2019-05-07HouseReferred to HEALTH

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=941
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0941&pn=1748
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0941&pn=2922
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0941&pn=4049
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0941&pn=4574
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0941&pn=4617
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=06/11/2019&RollCallId=679
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=852
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=895
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=11/20/2019&RollCallId=1429
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=33&theDate=06/29/2020&RollCallId=1033
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=682
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=709
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=10/21/2020&RollCallId=1260
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=11/18/2020&RollCallId=2633
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=11/18/2020&RollCallId=2632
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1732
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=770
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=17&theDate=11/20/2020&RollCallId=1301

Bill Comments 750

feedback