PA HB939 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on October 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-22 - Act No. 155
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on October 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-22 - Act No. 155
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 66 (Public Utilities) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in administration, further providing for assessment for regulatory expenses upon public utilities; in responsible utility customer protection, further providing for definitions, for cash deposits and household information requirements, for payment agreements, for termination of utility service, for reconnection of service, for late payment charge waiver and for complaints filed with commission, providing for public utility duties, further providing for automatic meter readings, for reporting to General Assembly and Governor, for nonapplicability and for construction and providing for expiration; in natural gas competition, further providing for requirements for natural gas suppliers; and, in restructuring of electric utility industry, further providing for requirements for electric generation suppliers.
Title
In administration, further providing for assessment for regulatory expenses upon public utilities; in responsible utility customer protection, further providing for definitions, for cash deposits and household information requirements, for payment agreements, for termination of utility service, for reconnection of service, for late payment charge waiver and for complaints filed with commission, providing for public utility duties, further providing for automatic meter readings, for reporting to General Assembly and Governor, for nonapplicability and for construction and providing for expiration; in natural gas competition, further providing for requirements for natural gas suppliers; and, in restructuring of electric utility industry, further providing for requirements for electric generation suppliers.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Godshall [R] | Rep. Vanessa Brown [D] | Rep. Peter Daley [D] | Rep. Tina Pickett [R] |
Sen. Thomas Killion [R] | Rep. Juliann Harhart [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-10-06 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-28 - House - HB 939 PN 2150, FP (Y: 188 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - House - HB 939 PN 2150, 2013 A2649, THOMAS (Y: 70 N: 129 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2013-06-27 - House - HB 939 PN 2150, 2013 A2648, THOMAS (Y: 81 N: 118 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2013-06-27 - House - HB 939 PN 2150, 2013 A2647, THOMAS (Y: 77 N: 122 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2013-06-27 - House - HB 939 PN 2150, 2013 A2646, THOMAS (Y: 86 N: 113 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2013-06-27 - House - HB 939 PN 2150, 2013 A2645, THOMAS (Y: 80 N: 119 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2013-06-27 - House - HB 939 PN 2150, 2013 A2644, THOMAS (Y: 69 N: 130 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2013-06-27 - House - HB 939 PN 2150, 2013 A2643, THOMAS (Y: 72 N: 128 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-06-27 - House - HB 939 PN 2150, 2013 A2642, THOMAS (Y: 92 N: 108 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-06-27 - House - HB 939 PN 2150, 2013 A2641, THOMAS (Y: 76 N: 124 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-06-27 - House - HB 939 PN 2150, 2013 A2640, THOMAS (Y: 87 N: 113 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-06-27 - House - HB 939 PN 2150, 2013 A2638, THOMAS (Y: 82 N: 118 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-06-27 - House - HB 939 PN 2150, 2013 A2637, THOMAS (Y: 96 N: 104 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-06-27 - House - HB 939 PN 2150, 2013 A2738, MUNDY (Y: 99 N: 101 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-06-27 - House - HB 939 PN 2150, 2013 A2737, MUNDY (Y: 93 N: 107 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-06-27 - House - HB 939 PN 2150, 2013 A2722, DAVIDSON (Y: 94 N: 106 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-06-27 - House - HB 939 PN 2150, 2013 A2723, KIM (Y: 88 N: 112 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-06-27 - House - HB 939 PN 2150, 2013 A2721, DALEY, P. (Y: 96 N: 104 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-06-27 - House - HB 939 PN 2150, 2013 A2720, KIM (Y: 93 N: 107 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-06-28 - House - HB 939 PN 2150, FP (Y: 188 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - House - HB 939 PN 2150, 2013 A2649, THOMAS (Y: 70 N: 129 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2013-06-27 - House - HB 939 PN 2150, 2013 A2648, THOMAS (Y: 81 N: 118 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2013-06-27 - House - HB 939 PN 2150, 2013 A2647, THOMAS (Y: 77 N: 122 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2013-06-27 - House - HB 939 PN 2150, 2013 A2646, THOMAS (Y: 86 N: 113 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2013-06-27 - House - HB 939 PN 2150, 2013 A2645, THOMAS (Y: 80 N: 119 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2013-06-27 - House - HB 939 PN 2150, 2013 A2644, THOMAS (Y: 69 N: 130 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2013-06-27 - House - HB 939 PN 2150, 2013 A2643, THOMAS (Y: 72 N: 128 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-06-27 - House - HB 939 PN 2150, 2013 A2642, THOMAS (Y: 92 N: 108 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-06-27 - House - HB 939 PN 2150, 2013 A2641, THOMAS (Y: 76 N: 124 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-06-27 - House - HB 939 PN 2150, 2013 A2640, THOMAS (Y: 87 N: 113 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-06-27 - House - HB 939 PN 2150, 2013 A2638, THOMAS (Y: 82 N: 118 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-06-27 - House - HB 939 PN 2150, 2013 A2637, THOMAS (Y: 96 N: 104 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-06-27 - House - HB 939 PN 2150, 2013 A2738, MUNDY (Y: 99 N: 101 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-06-27 - House - HB 939 PN 2150, 2013 A2737, MUNDY (Y: 93 N: 107 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-06-27 - House - HB 939 PN 2150, 2013 A2722, DAVIDSON (Y: 94 N: 106 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-06-27 - House - HB 939 PN 2150, 2013 A2723, KIM (Y: 88 N: 112 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-06-27 - House - HB 939 PN 2150, 2013 A2721, DALEY, P. (Y: 96 N: 104 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-06-27 - House - HB 939 PN 2150, 2013 A2720, KIM (Y: 93 N: 107 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-22 | House | Act No. 155 |
2014-10-22 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2014-10-15 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2014-10-14 | House | Signed in Senate |
2014-10-14 | House | Signed in House |
2014-10-14 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (193-0) |
2014-10-14 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2014-10-08 | House | Referred to RULES |
2014-10-08 | House | In the House |
2014-10-08 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2014-10-07 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-10-06 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-10-06 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2013-06-30 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2013-06-28 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-06-28 | House | Third consideration and final passage (188-13) |
2013-06-28 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-06-27 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-06-27 | House | Second consideration |
2013-06-27 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-06-25 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2013-06-25 | House | First consideration |
2013-06-25 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-03-12 | House | Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS |