PA HB929 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-21 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-21 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a roundabout at Pennsylvania Route 34, Spring Road, Pennsylvania Route 850, Valley Road, and Pisgah State Road in Carroll Township, Perry County, as the Shane E. Troutman Memorial Roundabout.
Title
Designating a roundabout at Pennsylvania Route 34, Spring Road, Pennsylvania Route 850, Valley Road, and Pisgah State Road in Carroll Township, Perry County, as the Shane E. Troutman Memorial Roundabout.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-23 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-21 | House | Removed from table |
2022-09-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-06-21 | House | Removed from table |
2022-06-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-04-11 | House | Removed from table |
2022-04-11 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-12-14 | House | Removed from table |
2021-12-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-09-28 | House | Removed from table |
2021-09-28 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-06-09 | House | Removed from table |
2021-06-09 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-03-24 | House | Removed from table |
2021-03-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-03-23 | House | First consideration |
2021-03-23 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-03-16 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |