PA HB925 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-8)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Act No. 40 of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-8)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Act No. 40 of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 12275, carrying State Route 1002 over the West Branch of the Susquehanna River, Castanea Township, Clinton County, as the Petty Officer Stephen "Turbo" Toboz, Jr., Bridge.
Title
Designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 12275, carrying State Route 1002 over the West Branch of the Susquehanna River, Castanea Township, Clinton County, as the Petty Officer Stephen "Turbo" Toboz, Jr., Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 925 PN 920, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Floor: HB 925 PN 920, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Floor: HB 925 PN 920, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Senate | Act No. 40 of 2021 |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Signed in House |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-06-22 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2021-04-07 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-04-07 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2021-04-07 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-04-06 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-04-06 | House | Second consideration |
2021-03-24 | House | Removed from table |
2021-03-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-03-23 | House | First consideration |
2021-03-23 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-03-16 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |