PA HB922 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-24 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-24 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 2, 1915 (P.L.736, No.338), known as the Workers' Compensation Act, in liability and compensation, further providing for compensable injuries, subrogation and proration.
Title
In liability and compensation, further providing for compensable injuries, subrogation and proration.
Sponsors
Rep. Eric Davanzo [R] | Rep. George Dunbar [R] | Rep. Robert Kauffman [R] | Rep. Dawn Keefer [R] |
Rep. Dan Moul [R] | Sen. Greg Rothman [R] | Rep. Kurt Masser [R] | Rep. Johnathan Hershey [R] |
Rep. Jeff Wheeland [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-14 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-24 | House | Removed from table |
2022-10-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-06-22 | House | Removed from table |
2022-06-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-04-12 | House | Removed from table |
2022-04-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-12-15 | House | Removed from table |
2021-12-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-09-29 | House | Removed from table |
2021-09-29 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-06-14 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-09 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-06-09 | House | Second consideration |
2021-06-08 | House | Removed from table |
2021-05-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-05-26 | House | First consideration |
2021-05-26 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |