PA HB911 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-02 - Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Banking & Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-02 - Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Banking & Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 17, 1921 (P.L.682, No.284), known as The Insurance Company Law of 1921, further providing for annual and other reports, penalties.
Title
Further providing for annual and other reports, penalties.
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Caltagirone [D] | Rep. Anthony DeLuca [D] | Rep. Gordon Denlinger [R] | Rep. Dan Frankel [D] |
Rep. John Siptroth [D] | Rep. Don Walko [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-03-30 - House - HB 911 PN 1285, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-25 - House - HB 911 PN 1030, 2009 A444, DELUCA (Y: 189 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-25 - House - HB 911 PN 1030, 2009 A444, DELUCA (Y: 189 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-02 | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE | |
2009-03-30 | In the Senate | |
2009-03-30 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-03-25 | Second consideration, with amendments | |
2009-03-25 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-03-18 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-03-18 | Removed from table | |
2009-03-18 | Laid on the table | |
2009-03-18 | First consideration | |
2009-03-18 | Reported as committed | |
2009-03-12 | Referred to INSURANCE |