PA HB908 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-19 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-19 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 1, 1933 (P.L.103, No.69), known as The Second Class Township Code, in township officers generally, further providing for removal for failure to perform duties.
Title
In township officers generally, further providing for removal for failure to perform duties.
Sponsors
Rep. Kate Harper [R] | Rep. Mauree Gingrich [R] | Rep. Chris Ross [R] | Rep. Robert Freeman [D] |
Rep. Mary Jo Daley [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - House Floor: HB 908 PN 1104, FP (Y: 188 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - House Floor: HB 908 PN 1104, FP (Y: 188 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-19 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2015-06-17 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-06-17 | House | Third consideration and final passage (188-1) |
2015-06-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-06-16 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-06-16 | House | Second consideration |
2015-06-16 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-06-03 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2015-06-03 | House | First consideration |
2015-06-03 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-04-06 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |