PA HB906 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on June 26 2007 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 1969-12-31 - Act No. 10
Status: Enrolled on June 26 2007 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 1969-12-31 - Act No. 10
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 31, 2003 (P.L.73, No.17), known as the Volunteer Fire Company and Volunteer Ambulance Service Grant Act, further defining "volunteer ambulance service"; further providing for guidelines and procedures, for award of grants and for expiration of authority; providing for publication and notice, for special provisions; and repealing an obsolete act.
Title
An Act amending the act of July 31, 2003 (P.L.73, No.17), known as the Volunteer Fire Company and Volunteer Ambulance Service Grant Act, further defining "volunteer ambulance service"; further providing for guidelines and procedures, for award of grants and for expiration of authority; providing for publication and notice, for special provisions; and repealing an obsolete act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-06-28 | Approved by the Governor | |
2007-06-26 | Presented to the Governor | |
2007-06-26 | Signed in Senate | |
2007-06-25 | Signed in House | |
2007-06-25 | Senate concurred in House amendments to Senate amendments | |
2007-06-25 | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed | |
2007-06-25 | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS | |
2007-06-21 | House concurred in Senate amendments, as amended by the House | |
2007-06-18 | Reported as committed | |
2007-06-14 | Referred to RULES | |
2007-06-13 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2007-06-12 | Second consideration | |
2007-06-12 | Re-reported as amended | |
2007-06-11 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-06-11 | First consideration | |
2007-06-11 | Reported as committed | |
2007-05-10 | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS | |
2007-05-08 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2007-05-07 | Amended on third consideration | |
2007-05-07 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-04-24 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-04-24 | Second consideration, with amendments | |
2007-04-18 | Removed from table | |
2007-04-17 | Laid on the table | |
2007-04-17 | First consideration | |
2007-04-17 | Reported as amended | |
2007-03-22 | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=906 |