PA HB900 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-4)
Status: Passed on December 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-14 - Act No. 47 of 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-4)
Status: Passed on December 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-14 - Act No. 47 of 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 61 (Prisons and Parole) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in general administration, further providing for State recording system for application of restraints to pregnant prisoners or detainees; in county correctional institutions, further providing for county recording system for application of restraints to pregnant prisoners or detainees; providing for Department of Human Services facilities; and, in miscellaneous provisions, further providing for healthy birth for incarcerated women and providing for restrictive housing prohibited for pregnant or postpartum incarcerated individuals and detainees, for cavity search and inspection restrictions, for training and education requirement, for feminine hygiene and incontinence products and for postpartum recovery.
Title
In general administration, further providing for State recording system for application of restraints to pregnant prisoners or detainees; in county correctional institutions, further providing for county recording system for application of restraints to pregnant prisoners or detainees; providing for Department of Human Services facilities; and, in miscellaneous provisions, further providing for healthy birth for incarcerated women and providing for restrictive housing prohibited for pregnant or postpartum incarcerated individuals and detainees, for cavity search and inspection restrictions, for training and education requirement, for feminine hygiene and incontinence products and for postpartum recovery.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-12-13 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 900 PN 2406, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-13 - House - House Floor: HB 900 PN 2406, CONCURRENCE (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A03225 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - House - House Floor: HB 900 PN 959, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A00209 (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 900 PN 2406, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-13 - House - House Floor: HB 900 PN 2406, CONCURRENCE (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A03225 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - House - House Floor: HB 900 PN 959, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A00209 (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-14 | House | Act No. 47 of 2023 |
2023-12-14 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2023-12-14 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2023-12-13 | House | Signed in Senate |
2023-12-13 | House | Signed in House |
2023-12-13 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (203-0) |
2023-12-13 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2023-12-13 | House | Referred to RULES |
2023-12-13 | House | In the House |
2023-12-13 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2023-12-12 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2023-12-12 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-12-12 | Senate | Second consideration |
2023-12-11 | Senate | First consideration |
2023-12-11 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2023-06-26 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2023-06-13 | Senate | In the Senate |
2023-06-13 | House | Third consideration and final passage (203-0) |
2023-06-13 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2023-06-06 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-06-06 | House | Second consideration |
2023-06-05 | House | Removed from table |
2023-04-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2023-04-21 | House | First consideration |
2023-04-21 | House | Reported as amended |
2023-04-12 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |