PA HB9 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-29 - Act No. 37
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-29 - Act No. 37
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 2, 1984 (P.L.561, No.112), known as the Pennsylvania Conservation Corps Act, further providing for expiration.
Title
Further providing for expiration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-29 - House - HB 9 PN 3939, CONCUR (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-28 - Senate - HB 9 PN 3939, FINAL PASSAGE-RECONSIDERED (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-22 - House - HB 9 PN 3360, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 142 N: 54 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-28 - Senate - HB 9 PN 3939, FINAL PASSAGE-RECONSIDERED (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-22 - House - HB 9 PN 3360, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 142 N: 54 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-29 | Act No. 37 | |
2010-06-29 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-06-29 | Presented to the Governor | |
2010-06-29 | Signed in Senate | |
2010-06-29 | Signed in House | |
2010-06-29 | House concurred in Senate amendments | |
2010-06-29 | Reported as committed | |
2010-06-29 | Referred to RULES | |
2010-06-28 | In the House | |
2010-06-28 | Final passage | |
2010-06-28 | Vote on final passage reconsidered | |
2010-06-28 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-06-22 | Second consideration | |
2010-06-21 | Re-reported as amended | |
2010-06-16 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-06-15 | Removed from table | |
2010-05-26 | Laid on the table | |
2010-04-13 | First consideration | |
2010-04-13 | Reported as amended | |
2010-03-29 | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY | |
2010-03-22 | In the Senate | |
2010-03-22 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-03-17 | Second consideration | |
2010-03-15 | Re-reported as amended | |
2009-09-11 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-09-11 | Removed from table | |
2009-09-10 | Laid on the table | |
2009-09-10 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-06-17 | Re-committed to RULES | |
2009-06-17 | First consideration | |
2009-06-17 | Reported as amended | |
2009-03-03 | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |