PA HB892 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 57-33)
Status: Enrolled on June 28 2007 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 1969-12-31 - Act No. 14
Status: Enrolled on June 28 2007 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 1969-12-31 - Act No. 14
Summary
An Act designating a portion of State Route 74 in Perry County as the Marine Lance Corporal Jason L. Frye Memorial Highway.
Title
An Act designating a portion of State Route 74 in Perry County as the Marine Lance Corporal Jason L. Frye Memorial Highway.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-06-30 | Approved by the Governor | |
2007-06-28 | Presented to the Governor | |
2007-06-27 | Signed in Senate | |
2007-06-26 | Signed in House | |
2007-06-26 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2007-06-20 | Second consideration | |
2007-06-19 | First consideration | |
2007-06-19 | Reported as committed | |
2007-05-23 | Referred to TRANSPORTATION | |
2007-05-21 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2007-05-21 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-05-07 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-05-07 | Second consideration | |
2007-04-25 | Removed from table | |
2007-04-24 | Laid on the table | |
2007-04-24 | First consideration | |
2007-04-24 | Reported as committed | |
2007-03-22 | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=892 |