PA HB867 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 35-14)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-02 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-02 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 17, 1921 (P.L.682, No.284), known as The Insurance Company Law of 1921, prohibiting discrimination against volunteer ambulance services.
Title
Prohibiting discrimination against volunteer ambulance services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-02 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-06-02 | Removed from table | |
2009-06-01 | Laid on the table | |
2009-06-01 | First consideration | |
2009-06-01 | Reported as amended | |
2009-03-11 | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |