PA HB857 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-24 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-24 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of January 28, 1988 (P.L.24, No.11), known as the Private Academic Schools Act, further providing for definitions, for State Board of Private Academic Schools, for powers and duties of board, for application for license, for issuance and renewal of license, for directory of private academic schools, for requirements for licensure and operation, for enforcement, refusal, suspension or revocation of license and for promulgation of rules and regulations.
Title
Further providing for definitions, for State Board of Private Academic Schools, for powers and duties of board, for application for license, for issuance and renewal of license, for directory of private academic schools, for requirements for licensure and operation, for enforcement, refusal, suspension or revocation of license and for promulgation of rules and regulations.
Sponsors
Rep. David Zimmerman [R] | Rep. David Hickernell [R] | Rep. Bryan Cutler [R] | Rep. David Millard [R] |
Rep. Robert Kauffman [R] | Sen. Cris Dush [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - House - House Floor: HB 857 PN 939, FP (Y: 190 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - House - House Floor: HB 857 PN 939, FP (Y: 190 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-04-23 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |
2017-05-22 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-05-22 | House | Third consideration and final passage (190-4) |
2017-05-22 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-05-10 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-05-10 | House | Second consideration |
2017-05-09 | House | Removed from table |
2017-05-08 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-05-08 | House | First consideration |
2017-05-08 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-03-13 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |