PA HB857 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-20 - Act No. 84
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-20 - Act No. 84
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 17, 1921 (P.L.682, No.284), known as The Insurance Company Law of 1921, in casualty insurance, providing for emergency service system billing; in automobile insurance issuance, renewal, cancellation and refusal, providing for coverage obligations of loaner vehicles; and, in children's health care, further providing for expiration.
Title
In casualty insurance, providing for emergency service system billing; in automobile insurance issuance, renewal, cancellation and refusal, providing for coverage obligations of loaner vehicles; and, in children's health care, further providing for expiration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-12-10 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-10 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-10 - House - House Floor: HB 857 PN 2631, CONCUR (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-12-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 857 PN 2631, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House Floor: HB 857 PN 1046, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-10 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-10 - House - House Floor: HB 857 PN 2631, CONCUR (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-12-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 857 PN 2631, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House Floor: HB 857 PN 1046, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-20 | House | Act No. 84 |
2015-12-20 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2015-12-10 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2015-12-10 | House | Signed in Senate |
2015-12-10 | House | Signed in House |
2015-12-10 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (197-0) |
2015-12-10 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2015-12-10 | House | Referred to RULES |
2015-12-09 | House | In the House |
2015-12-09 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2015-12-08 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2015-11-23 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2015-09-28 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-06-25 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE |
2015-04-22 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-04-22 | House | Third consideration and final passage (196-0) |
2015-04-22 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-04-21 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-04-21 | House | Second consideration |
2015-04-20 | House | Removed from table |
2015-04-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-04-13 | House | First consideration |
2015-04-13 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-03-31 | House | Referred to INSURANCE |