PA HB843 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-4)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Act No. 38
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 23 (Domestic Relations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in child custody, further providing for consideration of criminal conviction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In child custody, further providing for consideration of criminal conviction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 843 PN 827, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Floor: HB 843 PN 827, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-30SenateAct No. 38
2021-06-30SenateApproved by the Governor
2021-06-28SenatePresented to the Governor
2021-06-25SenateSigned in Senate
2021-06-25SenateSigned in House
2021-06-25SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2021-06-23SenateSecond consideration
2021-06-22SenateFirst consideration
2021-06-22SenateReported as committed
2021-05-28SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2021-05-25SenateIn the Senate
2021-05-25HouseThird consideration and final passage (201-0)
2021-05-25HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-05-24HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-05-24HouseSecond consideration
2021-05-05HouseRemoved from table
2021-04-20HouseLaid on the table
2021-04-20HouseFirst consideration
2021-04-20HouseReported as committed
2021-03-09HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=843
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0843&pn=0827
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0843P0827.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=04/20/2021&RollCallId=332
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=238
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/25/2021&RollCallId=481
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=39&theDate=06/22/2021&RollCallId=398
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=240

Bill Comments

feedback