PA HB838 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-26 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: Senate Consumer Protection & Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-26 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: Senate Consumer Protection & Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 6, 1980 (P.L.197, No.57), known as the Optometric Practice and Licensure Act, defining "ophthalmic surgery"; and further defining "practice of optometry."
Title
Defining "ophthalmic surgery"; and further defining "practice of optometry."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-22 - House - HB 838 PN 1854, FP (Y: 133 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - House - HB 838 PN 1854, MOT RECOM, PETRI (Y: 69 N: 132 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-06-22 - House - HB 838 PN 1854, MOT RECOM, PETRI (Y: 69 N: 132 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-26 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2011-06-22 | Senate | In the Senate |
2011-06-22 | House | Third consideration and final passage (133-68) |
2011-06-22 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2011-06-14 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-06-14 | House | Second consideration |
2011-06-13 | House | Removed from table |
2011-06-08 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-05-24 | House | Removed from table |
2011-05-11 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-05-11 | House | First consideration |
2011-05-11 | House | Reported as amended |
2011-04-28 | House | Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |