PA HB833 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of June 13, 1967 (P.L.31, No.21), known as the Human Services Code, in public assistance, further providing for verification of eligibility.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In public assistance, further providing for verification of eligibility.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-17 - House - House Floor: HB 833 PN 1332, 2019 A770, FRANKEL (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A00693 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-04-17HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-04-15HouseRemoved from table
2019-04-09HouseLaid on the table
2019-04-09HouseFirst consideration
2019-04-09HouseReported as amended
2019-03-14HouseReferred to HEALTH

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=833
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0833&pn=0933
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0833&pn=1332
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0833&pn=1492
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=04/09/2019&RollCallId=239
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=04/09/2019&RollCallId=240
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=200

Bill Comments

feedback