PA HB833 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-4)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-20 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-20 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in high schools, further providing for courses of study.
Title
In high schools, further providing for courses of study.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - House Floor: HB 833 PN 1557, FP (Y: 186 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - House Floor: HB 833 PN 1001, 2015 A872, RAPP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - House Floor: HB 833 PN 1557, FP (Y: 186 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - House Floor: HB 833 PN 1001, 2015 A872, RAPP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-20 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |
2015-05-13 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-05-13 | House | Third consideration and final passage (186-4) |
2015-05-13 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-05-12 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-05-12 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2015-05-11 | House | Removed from table |
2015-04-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-04-22 | House | First consideration |
2015-04-22 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-03-24 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |