PA HB810 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 10 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-12-13 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 10 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-12-13 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, providing for testing for controlled substances for prospective employees.
Title
Providing for testing for controlled substances for prospective employees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-12-10 - House - HB 810 PN 2577, FP (Y: 182 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-13 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |
2013-12-10 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-12-10 | House | Third consideration and final passage (182-12) |
2013-12-10 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-12-09 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-12-09 | House | Second consideration |
2013-11-20 | House | Removed from table |
2013-10-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-10-22 | House | First consideration |
2013-10-22 | House | Resolution to discharge committee from further consideration of this bill dropped from calendar |
2013-10-22 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-10-02 | House | Resolution to discharge committee from further consideration of this bill presented |
2013-03-21 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |