PA HB810 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-9)
Status: Engrossed on July 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-07-08 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-07-08 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 11, 1968 (P.L.149, No.84), known as the Volunteer Firefighters' Relief Association Act, further providing for funds of volunteer firefighters' relief associations.
Title
Further providing for funds of volunteer firefighters' relief associations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-07-02 - House - HB 810 PN 900, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-08 | Referred to FINANCE | |
2010-07-02 | In the Senate | |
2010-07-02 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-07-01 | Second consideration | |
2010-07-01 | Re-reported as committed | |
2010-06-28 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-06-28 | Re-reported as committed | |
2010-06-24 | Re-committed to RULES | |
2010-06-24 | First consideration | |
2010-06-24 | Reported as committed | |
2009-03-09 | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |