PA HB803 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-06-14 - First consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 51 (Military Affairs) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in National Guard Youth Challenge Program, further providing for definitions and for administration, establishing the Keystone State Challenge Academy Account and further providing for report and for audit required.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In National Guard Youth Challenge Program, further providing for definitions and for administration, establishing the Keystone State Challenge Academy Account and further providing for report and for audit required.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-06-14 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A02118 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Floor: HB 803 PN 1024, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Floor: HB 803 PN 935, 2021 A511, KEEFER (Y: 24 N: 177 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-23 - House - House Floor: HB 803 PN 935, 2021 A526, O'NEAL (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A00394 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-06-14SenateFirst consideration
2022-06-14SenateReported as amended
2021-03-25SenateReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
2021-03-24SenateIn the Senate
2021-03-24HouseThird consideration and final passage (201-0)
2021-03-24HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-03-23HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-03-23HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2021-03-22HouseRemoved from table
2021-03-16HouseLaid on the table
2021-03-16HouseFirst consideration
2021-03-16HouseReported as amended
2021-03-08HouseReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=803
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0803&pn=0787
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0803&pn=0935
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0803&pn=1024
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0803&pn=3240
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0803P1024.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=42&theDate=03/16/2021&RollCallId=129
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=42&theDate=03/16/2021&RollCallId=130
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=87
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=88
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=109
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=03/24/2021&RollCallId=246
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=21&theDate=06/14/2022&RollCallId=1086
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=21&theDate=06/14/2022&RollCallId=1085

Bill Comments

feedback