PA HB783 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Passed on October 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-19 - Act No. 81
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Passed on October 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-19 - Act No. 81
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in certificate of title and security interests, further providing for transfer of ownership of vehicles used for human habitation.
Title
In certificate of title and security interests, further providing for transfer of ownership of vehicles used for human habitation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-10 - House - House Floor: HB 783 PN 4136, CONCUR (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-10-09 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 783 PN 4139, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-02 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-02 - House - House Floor: HB 783 PN 858, FP (Y: 188 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-09-25 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-09 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 783 PN 4139, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-02 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-02 - House - House Floor: HB 783 PN 858, FP (Y: 188 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-09-25 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-19 | House | Act No. 81 |
2018-10-19 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2018-10-12 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2018-10-12 | House | Signed in Senate |
2018-10-10 | House | Signed in House |
2018-10-10 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (194-0) |
2018-10-09 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2018-10-09 | House | Referred to RULES |
2018-10-03 | House | In the House |
2018-10-03 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2018-10-01 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-10-01 | Senate | Second consideration, with amendments |
2018-09-25 | Senate | Removed from table |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2018-01-31 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-10-05 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2017-10-02 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-10-02 | House | Third consideration and final passage (188-0) |
2017-10-02 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-09-27 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-09-27 | House | Second consideration |
2017-09-26 | House | Removed from table |
2017-09-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-09-25 | House | First consideration |
2017-09-25 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |