PA HB783 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Passed on October 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-19 - Act No. 81
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in certificate of title and security interests, further providing for transfer of ownership of vehicles used for human habitation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In certificate of title and security interests, further providing for transfer of ownership of vehicles used for human habitation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-10 - House - House Floor: HB 783 PN 4136, CONCUR (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-10-09 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 783 PN 4139, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-02 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-02 - House - House Floor: HB 783 PN 858, FP (Y: 188 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-09-25 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-19HouseAct No. 81
2018-10-19HouseApproved by the Governor
2018-10-12HousePresented to the Governor
2018-10-12HouseSigned in Senate
2018-10-10HouseSigned in House
2018-10-10HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (194-0)
2018-10-09HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2018-10-09HouseReferred to RULES
2018-10-03HouseIn the House
2018-10-03SenateThird consideration and final passage (48-0)
2018-10-02SenateRe-reported as committed
2018-10-01SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-10-01SenateSecond consideration, with amendments
2018-09-25SenateRemoved from table
2018-04-18SenateLaid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
2018-01-31SenateFirst consideration
2018-01-31SenateReported as committed
2017-10-05SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2017-10-02SenateIn the Senate
2017-10-02HouseThird consideration and final passage (188-0)
2017-10-02HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-09-27HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-09-27HouseSecond consideration
2017-09-26HouseRemoved from table
2017-09-25HouseLaid on the table
2017-09-25HouseFirst consideration
2017-09-25HouseReported as committed
2017-03-09HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=783
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0783&pn=0858
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0783&pn=4136
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=09/25/2017&RollCallId=901
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=717
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=10/02/2017&RollCallId=928
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=19&theDate=01/31/2018&RollCallId=663
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=10/02/2018&RollCallId=1168
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=674
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=10/09/2018&RollCallId=2039
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1528

Bill Comments

feedback