PA HB783 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Engrossed on October 2 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in certificate of title and security interests, further providing for transfer of ownership of vehicles used for human habitation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In certificate of title and security interests, further providing for transfer of ownership of vehicles used for human habitation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-02 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-02 - House - House Floor: HB 783 PN 858, FP (Y: 188 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-09-25 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18SenateLaid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
2018-01-31SenateFirst consideration
2018-01-31SenateReported as committed
2017-10-05SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2017-10-02SenateIn the Senate
2017-10-02HouseThird consideration and final passage (188-0)
2017-10-02HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-09-27HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-09-27HouseSecond consideration
2017-09-26HouseRemoved from table
2017-09-25HouseLaid on the table
2017-09-25HouseFirst consideration
2017-09-25HouseReported as committed
2017-03-09HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=783
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0783&pn=0858
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=09/25/2017&RollCallId=901
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=717
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=10/02/2017&RollCallId=928
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=19&theDate=01/31/2018&RollCallId=663

Bill Comments

feedback