PA HB761 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-06 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-06 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 17, 1968 (P.L.1224, No.387), known as the Unfair Trade Practices and Consumer Protection Law, further providing for private actions.
Title
Further providing for private actions.
Sponsors
Rep. Anthony DeLuca [D] | Rep. Carol Hill-Evans [D] | Rep. Ed Neilson [D] | Rep. Joseph Ciresi [D] |
Rep. Margo Davidson [D] | Rep. Emily Kinkead [D] | Rep. Robert Freeman [D] | Rep. Thom Welby [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-06 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-07-06 | House | Removed from table |
2022-05-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-05-24 | House | First consideration |
2022-05-24 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-03-03 | House | Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS |