PA HB741 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Act No. 35 of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Act No. 35 of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, in powers and duties of the Department of Drug and Alcohol Programs, providing for notification of emergency contact.
Title
In powers and duties of the Department of Drug and Alcohol Programs, providing for notification of emergency contact.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-25 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - House - House Floor: HB 741 PN 1866, CONCUR (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 741 PN 1866, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - House Floor: HB 741 PN 1153, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Human Services: Adopt Amendment A00624 (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Health: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - House - House Floor: HB 741 PN 1866, CONCUR (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 741 PN 1866, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - House Floor: HB 741 PN 1153, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Human Services: Adopt Amendment A00624 (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Health: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | House | Act No. 35 of 2021 |
2021-06-30 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2021-06-28 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2021-06-25 | House | Signed in Senate |
2021-06-25 | House | Signed in House |
2021-06-25 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (201-0) |
2021-06-25 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2021-06-24 | House | Referred to RULES |
2021-06-24 | House | In the House |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-06-21 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2021-04-20 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-04-20 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2021-04-20 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-04-19 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-04-19 | House | Second consideration |
2021-04-07 | House | Removed from table |
2021-04-06 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-04-06 | House | First consideration |
2021-04-06 | House | Reported as amended |
2021-03-17 | House | Re-referred to HUMAN SERVICES |
2021-03-17 | House | Reported with request to re-refer to HUMAN SERVICES |
2021-03-03 | House | Referred to HEALTH |