PA HB726 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-11)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-10-14 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-10-14 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of November 24, 2004 (P.L.1270, No.153), referred to as the Pennsylvania Amber Alert System Law, further providing for Pennsylvania Amber Alert System established, for prohibited use, for coordination with other jurisdictions and for immunity; and creating the Missing Endangered Person Advisory System.
Title
Further providing for Pennsylvania Amber Alert System established, for prohibited use, for coordination with other jurisdictions and for immunity; and creating the Missing Endangered Person Advisory System.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-14 - House - HB 726 PN 3797, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-10-14 | Laid on the table | |
2010-10-12 | First consideration | |
2010-10-12 | Reported as committed | |
2010-06-17 | Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE | |
2010-06-14 | In the Senate | |
2010-06-14 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-06-09 | Second consideration | |
2010-06-09 | Re-reported as committed | |
2010-05-26 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-05-26 | Removed from table | |
2010-05-25 | Laid on the table | |
2010-05-25 | First consideration | |
2010-05-25 | Reported as amended | |
2009-03-05 | Referred to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES |