PA HB704 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-10-17 - Re-referred to EDUCATION
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-10-17 - Re-referred to EDUCATION
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, further providing for definitions; and providing for the distribution of special education funding for student achievement and instruction of eligible students and for special education accountability.
Title
Further providing for definitions; and providing for the distribution of special education funding for student achievement and instruction of eligible students and for special education accountability.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-17 | House | Re-referred to EDUCATION |
2011-10-17 | House | Reported with request to re-refer to EDUCATION |
2011-06-28 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-06-28 | House | Reported with request to re-refer to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-06-08 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |