PA HB687 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-5)
Status: Passed on July 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-02 - Act No. 39
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An Act amending Title 62 (Procurement) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in guaranteed energy savings contracts, further providing for definitions, for contracting procedures and for contract provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In guaranteed energy savings contracts, further providing for definitions, for contracting procedures and for contract provisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-06-23 - House - HB 687 PN 3902, CONCUR (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-21 - Senate - HB 687 PN 3902, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-11-10 - House - HB 687 PN 760, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-07-02 Act No. 39
2010-07-02 Approved by the Governor
2010-06-28 Presented to the Governor
2010-06-28 Signed in Senate
2010-06-23 Signed in House
2010-06-23 House concurred in Senate amendments
2010-06-23 Reported as committed
2010-06-22 Referred to RULES
2010-06-21 In the House
2010-06-21 Third consideration and final passage
2010-06-15 Second consideration
2010-06-14 Re-reported as amended
2010-05-26 Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2010-04-13 First consideration
2010-04-13 Reported as committed
2009-12-17 Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
2009-11-10 In the Senate
2009-11-10 Third consideration and final passage
2009-11-09 Second consideration
2009-09-18 Removed from table
2009-09-18 Laid on the table
2009-08-18 Removed from table
2009-08-18 Laid on the table
2009-08-04 Removed from table
2009-08-04 Laid on the table
2009-07-20 Removed from table
2009-07-20 Laid on the table
2009-06-25 Removed from table
2009-06-25 Laid on the table
2009-06-02 Re-reported as committed
2009-03-16 Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2009-03-16 Removed from table
2009-03-11 Laid on the table
2009-03-11 First consideration
2009-03-11 Reported as committed
2009-03-03 Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback