PA HB674 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 31-2)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-06 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Status: Introduced on March 9 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-06 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 31, 1968 (P.L.769, No.240), referred to as the Commonwealth Documents Law, further defining "administrative regulation" in relation to the Department of Environmental Protection.
Title
An Act amending the act of July 31, 1968 (P.L.769, No.240), referred to as the Commonwealth Documents Law, further defining "administrative regulation" in relation to the Department of Environmental Protection.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-02-06 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2008-02-06 | Removed from table | |
2008-02-05 | Laid on the table | |
2008-02-05 | First consideration | |
2008-02-05 | Reported as committed | |
2007-03-09 | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=674 |